Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Álvares da Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1651³BornLisboa, Portugal
25 Jul 167422.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jul 167422.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 170654.4SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
7 Jun 170654.7ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
27 Feb 170755.5Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
9 Sep 172069.0SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
20 Jan 172169.4ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
10 Jan 173381.3DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Álvares da Costa:
Bishop Manuel Álvares da Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,293
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87, and Page 296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015