Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeu do Pilar, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belém do Pará


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1667BornVila das Vellas, Portugal
31 Oct 168619.1ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
4 Mar 172052.5AppointedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
22 Dec 172053.3Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
9 Apr 173365.6DiedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeu do Pilar:
Bishop Bartolomeu do Pilar O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Belém do Pará

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013