Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel a Santa Catharina, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angola e Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661²BornLisboa, Portugal
12 Dec 171958.9SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
20 Mar 172059.2ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
14 Jul 172059.5Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
1 Nov 173170.8DiedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel a Santa Catharina:
Bishop Manuel a Santa Catharina O. Carm. (born 1661, died ) Bishop of Angola e Congo

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015