Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Malacca, Singapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1707Born
19 May 173124.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 173831.5SelectedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
3 Sep 173831.6ConfirmedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
5 Oct 173831.7Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
9 Aug 174336.5DiedBishop of Malacca, Singapore

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Castro
Bishop Antonio de Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Malacca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla de Rey, Portugal

  • a priest for 12.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017