Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Spinola, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1654Born
1 Jun 167319.1EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
28 Jun 169440.2DiedPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Jun 169440.2AppointedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francisco Spinola
Father Francisco Spinola S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast