Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Pierre (Andreas) Borgniet, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China

Titular Bishop of Berissa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1811Born
1835²23.8Ordained PriestPriest
1845¹33.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
2 Apr 185645.1AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China
24 May 185948.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China
24 May 185948.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Berissa
2 Oct 185948.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berissa
31 Jul 186251.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André-Pierre (Andreas) Borgniet
Bishop André-Pierre (Andreas) Borgniet S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz, Diocese of Mainz, Germany, Germany

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017