Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mathurin Lemaître, S.J. †

Deceased

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1816Born
183923.0Ordained PriestPriest
1841²25.0EnteredPriest of Society of Jesus
1862²46.0AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China
3 May 186347.3DiedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Mathurin Lemaître
Father Mathurin Lemaître S.J. (born , died ) Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Charles, Diocese of Le Mans, France
Death PlaceXujiahui/Zikawei (Jiangsu)

  • a priest for 24.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast