Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory (Grégoire) Luo Wenzao (Lou, López), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
1633²18.0Converted
7 Mar 165136.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Jun 165439.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Jan 167459.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing], China
3 Jan 167459.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
8 Apr 168570.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
10 Apr 169075.2AppointedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
27 Feb 169176.1DiedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregory (Grégoire) Luo Wenzao (Lou, López) (VIAF: 305949883)
Bishop Gregory (Grégoire) Luo Wenzao (Lou, López) O.P. (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuojiaxiang, Fu'an
Ordained BishopSt. Francis, Church, Canton
Death PlaceNanjing, Diocese of Nanking [Nanjing]

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 4
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Apr 2020

Quantcast