Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel de Poblete Casasola

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹Born
20 May 164846.3SelectedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
21 Jan 164947.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
4 Sep 165048.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
22 Jul 165351.5InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
8 Dec 166765.9DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Poblete Casasola
Archbishop Miguel de Poblete Casasola (born 1602, died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 230
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 20
  • ob: CB, 15 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017