Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Mañozca y Zamora

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
14 Jul 164363.5SelectedArchbishop of México, Federal District
16 Nov 164363.8ConfirmedArchbishop of México, Federal District
24 Feb 164565.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
12 Dec 165070.9DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Mañozca y Zamora
Archbishop Juan de Mañozca y Zamora (born 1580, died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarquina, Spain
Ordained BishopPuebla de los Angeles, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 241
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 174, Number 1,082
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 8
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,116
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,610

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast