Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo de Cárdenas, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateEventTitle
30 May 1650AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
28 May 1651Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
22 Jul 1653InstalledBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
May 1661³DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Cárdenas
Bishop Rodrigo de Cárdenas O.P. (died May 1661) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopConvent, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,425
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 180, Number 1,122
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 261
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 13
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 96, Number 8,155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 25 Nov 2020

Quantcast