Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymund Wang Chong Lin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1921Born
30 Nov 195029.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 198361.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China
16 Feb 199876.5InstalledBishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China
12 Mar 200684.6ResignedBishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China
2 Feb 201088.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China

MicroData Summary for Raymund Wang Chong Lin
Bishop Raymund Wang Chong Lin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYuejiazhuang, Ningjin county
Death PlaceZhaoxian, Diocese of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast