Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]

Dioecesis Ciaoscienensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Pien-Tsun, Catholic Mission, Kao-y, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian]
18 March 1929ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian]
11 January 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian] Vicariate Apostolic of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian]
Diocese of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian] Diocese of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]
194745,000900,0005.0%39391,1536818ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 31 May 2013