Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Jiang Ming Yuan, C.D.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1931Born
12 Jul 198150.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 200069.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China
22 Mar 200675.0SucceededBishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China
13 Jul 200877.3DiedBishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Jiang Ming Yuan
Bishop Joseph Jiang Ming Yuan C.D.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Zhaoxian [Chaohsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDacaozhuang, Ningjin county
Death PlaceBiancun

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast