Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Yang Libo

Deceased

Bishop of Lanzhou [Lanchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1919Born
1 Jul 194930.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 198869.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lanzhou [Lanchow], China
15 Feb 199878.6DiedBishop of Lanzhou [Lanchow], China

MicroData Summary for Philip Yang Libo
Bishop Philip Yang Libo (born , died ) Bishop of Lanzhou [Lanchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKulang

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c23: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 48
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast