Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Li Zhenrong, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1919³Born
31 May 1951³31.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Apr 198363.5Ordained BishopBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
19 Apr 1992³72.5DiedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Li Zhenrong
Bishop Paul Li Zhenrong S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast