Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Gu Zheng, S.J.

Bishop of Xining [Sining], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1937 Born
30 Jul 198245.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Sep 199154.5Ordained BishopBishop of Xining [Sining], China

MicroData Summary for Mathias Gu Zheng
Bishop Mathias Gu Zheng S.J. (born ) Bishop of Xining [Sining]

Please contact the Bishop through the Prefecture Apostolic of Xining [Sining].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast