Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Constantin Daems, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Superior General of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1872Born
1 Sep 188917.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 Jun 189523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
5 May 191441.9AppointedPrefect of Southern Kansu {Kansu Meridionale}, China
8 Mar 192249.8ResignedPrefect of Southern Kansu {Kansu Meridionale}, China
23 Jun 193058.1AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
11 Dec 193462.5DiedSuperior General of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary

MicroData Summary for Constantin Daems
Father Constantin Daems C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Superior General of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestmalle, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Death Place(while traveling), Russian Federation

  • a priest for 39.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast