Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luigi Nogara, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1884Born
1905²20.1ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
18 Apr 190823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1942²57.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China
1946²61.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China
28 Jun 195469.6DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Nogara
Father Luigi Nogara P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBellano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceGrugana

  • a priest for 46.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast