Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giuseppe Zambarbieri, F.D.P. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Sons of Divine Providence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1914Born
20 Dec 194127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
2 Feb 194328.1ProfessedPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
9 Mar 196348.2AppointedSuperior General of Sons of Divine Providence
May 1975²60.4CeasedSuperior General of Sons of Divine Providence
15 Jan 198873.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Sons of Divine Providence

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Zambarbieri
Father Giuseppe Zambarbieri F.D.P. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Sons of Divine Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlacePecorara, Diocese of Piacenza, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Bartolomeo, Church, Borzonasca, Diocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Tortona, Diocese of Tortona, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Santuario della Madonna della Guardia, Crypt, Tortona, Diocese of Tortona, Italy

  • a priest for 46.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast