Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Piazza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albenga-Imperia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1915BornGenova
11 Jun 193822.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 196549.8AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
24 Jun 196549.9Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
6 Oct 199075.2RetiredBishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy
10 Sep 199580.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Albenga-Imperia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Piazza:
Bishop Alessandro Piazza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albenga-Imperia

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 15 Oct 2014