Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Sibilla

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1923BornTorino
29 Jun 195229.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 197451.1AppointedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
29 Sep 197451.3Ordained BishopBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
8 Sep 198057.3AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
16 Mar 198965.8ResignedBishop of Asti, Italy
12 Aug 200885.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franco Sibilla:
Bishop Franco Sibilla (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Asti

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015