Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Vivaldo

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1915BornNoli
13 Dec 193722.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 197055.4AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
28 Oct 197055.5Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
13 Mar 199074.9DiedBishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Vivaldo:
Bishop Lorenzo Vivaldo (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Marittima-Piombino

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013