Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Aurelio Ghiglione, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Benghazi

Titular Bishop of Gauriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1884BornGenova, Italy
13 Jun 190823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 Jul 195166.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Benghazi, Libya
5 Jul 195166.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gauriana
23 Sep 195166.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gauriana
8 Jun 196479.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Benghazi, Libya

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Aurelio Ghiglione:
Bishop Ernesto Aurelio Ghiglione O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Benghazi

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1960
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1951, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013