Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pacifico Celso Carletti, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pacifico of Seggiano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1859Born
2 Aug 187717.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Aug 188021.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Feb 188222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 May 190848.7ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 May 191454.7CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Sep 191455.0AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
13 Sep 191455.0Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
23 Oct 191455.2DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pacifico Celso Carletti
Bishop Pacifico Celso Carletti O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeggiano

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 44
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 45
  • mige: AJ, 17 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018