Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cletus Vincent Pejov (Peef), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv

Titular Bishop of Lyrbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1873BornBaltagia
1896²22.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Dec 191239.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
13 Dec 191239.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
2 Mar 191339.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
12 Oct 191642.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
3 Nov 194168.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cletus Vincent Pejov (Peef):
Bishop Cletus Vincent Pejov (Peef) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1913, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013