Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominique Jacquet (Jaquet), O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iaşi, Romania

Titular Archbishop of Salamis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1843Born
22 Jul 186622.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 188339.8ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Jan 189551.2AppointedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
10 Mar 189551.4Ordained BishopBishop of Iaşi, Romania
1903¹59.2ResignedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
25 Feb 190460.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Salamis
3 Feb 193187.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Iaşi, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique Jacquet (Jaquet) (VIAF: 316441749)
Archbishop Dominique Jacquet (Jaquet) O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iaşi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrolley, Diocese of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 317
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017