Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Maurice Bovet

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1865Born
25 Aug 189125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
30 Nov 191146.0AppointedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
13 Feb 191246.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
3 Aug 191549.6DiedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for André-Maurice Bovet
Bishop André-Maurice Bovet (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne et Genève

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAutigny

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018