Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Achille Quadrozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1846Born
14 Nov 190458.6AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
20 Nov 190458.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
5 Dec 191367.7DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Achille Quadrozzi
Bishop Achille Quadrozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeroli, Diocese of Veroli
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 61
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,824

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast