Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Riehl, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

Titular Bishop of Colophon

Prefect of Sénégal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1835BornKuttolsheim, France
1854¹19.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
18 Jun 185924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
23 Nov 188348.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
23 Nov 188348.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Colophon
23 Nov 188348.9AppointedPrefect of Sénégal
16 Dec 188348.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colophon
23 Jul 188651.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Riehl:
Bishop François-Xavier Riehl C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013