Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Matthieu de La Foata

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1817Born
23 Dec 184326.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 187760.3SelectedBishop of Ajaccio, France
21 Sep 187760.4ConfirmedBishop of Ajaccio, France
11 Nov 187760.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
3 Jan 189981.7DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Matthieu de La Foata (VIAF: 61673439)
Bishop Paul-Matthieu de La Foata (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAzilone
Ordained BishopLazaristes, rue de Sevres, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017