Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Arthur Sheltz

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Hirina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1946 Born
15 May 197125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
21 Feb 201265.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
21 Feb 201265.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
2 May 201266.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
22 Jun 202175.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for George Arthur Sheltz
Bishop George Arthur Sheltz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHouston, Diocese of Galveston, Texas
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Co-Cathedral, Houston, Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Galveston-Houston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 28 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,429
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jun 2021

Quantcast