Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gary Wayne Janak

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of San Antonio, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Dionysiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1962 Born
14 May 198826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Victoria in Texas, USA
27 Apr 201553.0AppointedAdministrator of Victoria in Texas, USA
29 Jun 201553.2CeasedAdministrator of Victoria in Texas, USA
15 Feb 202158.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
15 Feb 202158.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
20 Apr 202159.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysiana

MicroData Summary for Gary Wayne Janak
Father Gary Wayne Janak (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of San Antonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Campo, TX, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas
Ordained BishopSt. Mark the Evangelist, Church, San Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of San Antonio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2021
  • mn: CB, 15 Feb 2021
  • ob: CB, 18 Feb 2021
  • c2: CB, 24 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast