Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Boulette

Auxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Hieron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1950 Born
12 Jan 197524.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Antonio, Texas, USA
19 Mar 197625.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
23 Jan 201766.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
23 Jan 201766.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hieron
20 Mar 201766.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hieron

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Boulette
Bishop Michael Joseph Boulette (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Antonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHusdon Falls, Diocese of Albany, New York
Ordained DeaconAssumption Seminary, Chapel, San Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas
Ordained PriestSt. Mary's, Church, Fredericksburg, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas
Ordained BishopSt. Mark the Evangelist, Church, San Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San Antonio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2017
  • mn: CB, 23 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 23 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 6 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Mar 2017