Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sylvester Joseph Espelage, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang], China

Titular Bishop of Oreus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1877Born
189214.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 Jan 190022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Jul 192548.3AppointedPrefect of Wuchang [Wuchang], China
10 Jun 193053.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang], China
30 Jun 193053.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Oreus
17 Sep 193053.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oreus
25 Oct 194063.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang], China

MicroData Summary for Sylvester Joseph Espelage
Bishop Sylvester Joseph Espelage O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati, OH, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
Ordained BishopCincinnati, OH, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
Death PlaceWuchang, Vicariate Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang]

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1930, Number 60
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast