Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Maria Corrado Ferroni, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Laohekou [Laohokow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1892Born
17 Dec 191422.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Aug 192028.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Oct 193038.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Laohokow [Laohekou], China
28 Jan 193239.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Laohokow [Laohekou], China
28 Jan 193239.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aspendus
29 May 193240.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aspendus
11 Apr 194654.1AppointedBishop of Laohekou [Laohokow], China
10 Mar 196674.1DiedBishop of Laohekou [Laohokow], China

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria Corrado Ferroni
Bishop Alfonso Maria Corrado Ferroni O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Laohekou [Laohokow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRignano, Italy

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017