Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Gaudenzio Stanchi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Changsha [Changsha]

Titular Bishop of Pharbaethus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1886BornRivarone, Italy
190114.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
191124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Mar 193347.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Changsha [Changsha], China
8 Mar 193347.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
1 Oct 193347.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
7 Feb 193953.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Changsha [Changsha], China

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Gaudenzio Stanchi:
Bishop Giacinto Gaudenzio Stanchi O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Changsha [Changsha]

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013