Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Ryan

Deceased

Bishop of Alton, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1848Born
24 Dec 187123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
28 Feb 188839.6AppointedBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA
1 May 188839.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA
2 Jul 192375.0DiedBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for James Ryan
Bishop James Ryan (born , died ) Bishop of Alton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFarnaybridge, Thurles, Ireland

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017