Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph O’Farrell

Deceased

Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1832Born
18 Aug 185522.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 188148.6AppointedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
1 Nov 188148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
2 Apr 189461.3DiedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph O’Farrell (VIAF: 315944663)
Bishop Michael Joseph O’Farrell (born , died ) Bishop of Trenton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 563
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017