Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph Sweeney

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Honolulu, Hawaii

Titular Bishop of Vicus Aterii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1898BornSan Francisco, CA
24 Jun 192527.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
20 May 194142.9AppointedBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
25 Jul 194143.1Ordained BishopBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
6 Mar 196869.7ResignedBishop of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA
6 Mar 196869.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Aterii
20 Jun 196870.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Honolulu, Hawaii, USA

MicroData Summary for James Joseph Sweeney:
Bishop James Joseph Sweeney (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Honolulu

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013