Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Merlin Joseph Guilfoyle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Stockton, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1908Born
10 Jun 193324.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
24 Aug 195042.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Francisco, California, USA
24 Aug 195042.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulla
21 Sep 195042.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulla
12 Nov 196961.3AppointedBishop of Stockton, California, USA
4 Sep 197971.1ResignedBishop of Stockton, California, USA
20 Nov 198173.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Stockton, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Merlin Joseph Guilfoyle
Bishop Merlin Joseph Guilfoyle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Stockton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Francisco

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018