Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Anthony Appelhans, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Catula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1905Born
5 May 193226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Jul 194842.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea
8 Jul 194842.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Catula
30 Nov 194842.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catula
16 Jul 195145.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Stephen Anthony Appelhans
Bishop Stephen Anthony Appelhans S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern New Guinea

EventPlace
Birth PlacePfeifer, KS, USA

  • a priest for 19.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018