Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Francis Tanner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1905Born
30 May 193126.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 196560.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamasba
21 Dec 196560.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamasba
15 Feb 196863.0AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
21 Apr 197974.2ResignedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
29 Jul 199489.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Francis Tanner
Bishop Paul Francis Tanner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeoria, WI

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017