Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Henry Walsh

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York

Titular Bishop of Abthugni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1937BornBrooklyn
16 Aug 196325.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Jun 196628.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Dec 198447.3IncardinatedPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
3 Apr 200365.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
3 Apr 200365.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abthugni
29 May 200365.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abthugni
17 Aug 201275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
18 Oct 201477.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Henry Walsh:
Bishop Paul Henry Walsh (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,386
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2012
  • d: CB, 20 Oct 2014
  • c1: CB, 22 Oct 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015