Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emil Aloysius Wcela

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York

Titular Bishop of Filaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1931 BornBay Shore
2 Jun 195625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
21 Oct 198857.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
21 Oct 198857.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Filaca
13 Dec 198857.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Filaca
3 Apr 200775.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Emil Aloysius Wcela:
Bishop Emil Aloysius Wcela (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rockville Centre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,924

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 21 Oct 2014