Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Philip Kellenberg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1901Born
2 Jun 192826.9Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
25 Aug 195352.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
25 Aug 195352.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioannina
5 Oct 195352.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioannina
19 Jan 195452.6AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
16 Apr 195755.8AppointedBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
27 May 195755.9InstalledBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
3 May 197674.9RetiredBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
11 Jan 198684.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Walter Philip Kellenberg
Bishop Walter Philip Kellenberg (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018