Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Anthony Libasci

Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1951 BornJackson Heights, NY
1 Apr 197826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
3 Apr 200755.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
3 Apr 200755.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafis
1 Jun 200755.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satafis
19 Sep 201159.9AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
8 Dec 201160.1InstalledBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Anthony Libasci:
Bishop Peter Anthony Libasci (born ) Bishop of Manchester

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manchester.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,426
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2011
  • b/c1/i: Website of the Diocese, 19 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013