Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Edward McManus

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1914BornChicago
15 Apr 193925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Jun 196753.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 Jun 196753.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
24 Aug 196753.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
24 Aug 197662.5AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
19 Oct 197662.7InstalledBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
18 Feb 198571.0RetiredBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
3 Mar 199783.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for William Edward McManus:
Bishop William Edward McManus (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015