Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Levi Bonatto, Opus Dei

Auxiliary Bishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Accia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1957 Born
10 Mar 199638.2Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
8 Oct 201456.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil
8 Oct 201456.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Accia
14 Dec 201457.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Accia

MicroData Summary for Levi Bonatto
Bishop Levi Bonatto Opus Dei (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Goiânia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão José dos Pinhais

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Goiânia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2014
  • ob: CB, 4 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 24 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast