Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Moacir Silva

Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

Apostolic Administrator of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1954 Born
6 Dec 198632.3Ordained PriestPriest of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Oct 200450.2AppointedBishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Dec 200450.4Ordained BishopBishop of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Apr 201358.7AppointedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
18 Aug 202167.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Moacir Silva
Archbishop Moacir Silva (born ) Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão José dos Campos, Diocese of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopSão José dos Campos, Diocese of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ribeirão Preto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,724
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2013
  • aadm: Bollettino, 18 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Aug 2021

Quantcast